1ST SURBITON GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Group continues to be managed by the Group Executive Committee consisting of both lay and uniformed personnel. This committee has carried out fund raising, and maintains the links with the local authority, community, school and church. The development of the young people has been through training and learning verious skills and gaining badges.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 14 February 1964: Standard registration
- 1ST SURBITON (SEALION) SEA SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- 1ST SURBITON SEALION SEA SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dan Gibson | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Niloufer Byramji | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Henrik Svensson | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linh T N Bui | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROGER JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PENNY BLUNDELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.07k | £72.35k | £56.91k | £60.94k | £70.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.46k | £51.09k | £71.81k | £69.15k | £68.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.49k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4 JANUARY 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28 MARCH 1949, 18 FEBRUARY 1959, 5 MAY 1967 AND 19 JULY 1991.
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Surbiton Sea Scout Group
The Scout Hut
Electric Parade
SURBITON
Surrey
KT6 5NT
- Phone:
- 02083992777
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window