Financial history 1ST STREATHAM COMMON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.88k £0 £5.07k £9.73k £19.60k
Total expenditure £2.79k £1.70k £1.55k £4.30k £5.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A