1ST STREATHAM COMMON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

well bing of young people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £19,600
Total expenditure: £5,947

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 January 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 1ST STREATHAM COMMON BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOAN MOOREY Chair
None on record
Gary Cooper Trustee 09 July 2023
None on record
Keith Marrell Trustee 28 April 2020
None on record
G R COOPER Trustee 19 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.88k £0 £5.07k £9.73k £19.60k
Total expenditure £2.79k £1.70k £1.55k £4.30k £5.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 March 2024 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
84 MIDDLETON ROAD
MORDEN
SM4 6RR
Phone:
02086460231
Website:

No information available