4TH STREATHAM (PRINCESS MARIE LOUISE'S OWN) SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In accordance with scout association rules and regulations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 08 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark David Weeks | Chair | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Christopher James Hill | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Eric Lacy | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Remy Joshua Maxwell-Thompson | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Hiller | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Philip Newell Semmens | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Curry | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis John Edward Postles | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Peter Taylor | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
LAURA YATES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA PARSONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NARDEN MOONEAPILLAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.99k | £86.46k | £78.05k | £86.57k | £108.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.27k | £78.71k | £81.38k | £83.68k | £133.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 20TH FEBRUARY 1964 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATON TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE 4TH STREATHAM (PRINCESS MARIE LOUISE'S OWN) SEA SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
STREATHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Veronica Road
LONDON
SW17 8QL
- Phone:
- 0774 0023389
- Email:
- trustees@the4thstreatham.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window