4th Lewisham (1st Hither Green) Scout Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting or the Scout Movement is a movement that aims to support young people in their physical, mental and spiritual development, that they may play constructive roles in society, with a strong focus on the outdoors and survival skills
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lewisham
Governance
- 21 November 1962: Standard registration
- THE SPRINGBANK SCOUT TRUST (4TH LEWISHAM SOUTH (1ST HITHER GREEN) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Greg Noonan | Chair | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alasdair Gray | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Dowling | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esther Nicoli | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Nicoli | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Gainey | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Forsdyke | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janet Gainey | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gavin FORSDYKE | Trustee | 10 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jon Forsdyke | Trustee | 01 March 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.39k | £33.44k | £29.70k | £42.79k | £42.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.62k | £14.30k | £26.50k | £39.17k | £44.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.00k | £21.49k | £9.59k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26TH NOVEMBER 1954 AS VARIED AND AFFECTED BY SCHEME OF 27TH NOVEMBER 1998 as amended on 14 Jun 2019 as amended on 06 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
The Aim of the Scout Group is that of The Scout Association, to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local national and international communities.
Area of benefit
HITHER GREEN AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ted Ray Scout Hall
123-127 Springbank Road
London
SE13 6SS
- Phone:
- 02086982478
- Email:
- tedrayscouthall@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window