Trustees 22ND WIMBLEDON SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 303795

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy James Kerridge | Chair | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jasminder Kirkham | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Charles Crighton | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Davis | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cheetham | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Elizabeth Edwards | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elaine Gleeson | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Maloney | Trustee | 06 June 2000 |
|
|
||||
MR ANDY PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN FELLOWES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM FAIRCLOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.