17TH EPPING FOREST SOUTH SCOUT-GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
scouting and guiding activities for young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Redbridge
Governance
- 03 April 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan William Groom | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
COLIN MASTERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET JANICE CLARE WIDDECOMBE MA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.54k | £17.99k | £14.82k | £14.82k | £21.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.43k | £16.14k | £19.07k | £19.07k | £23.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 17TH SEPTEMBER 1967 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955.
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
SOUTH WOODFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 PULTENEY ROAD
LONDON
E18 1PS
- Phone:
- 02089898437
- Email:
- maggiewiddecombe@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window