Financial history 1ST BELMONT SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.93k £374 £5.23k £12.95k £6.13k
Total expenditure £7.77k £5.25k £7.08k £8.10k £8.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A