1ST BELMONT SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 303835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides Scouting activities to young people, male and female, from age 6.5 years to 15 years.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,130
Total expenditure: £8,481

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey
  • Sutton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 December 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NERISSA BUCKELL Chair 10 October 2023
None on record
Philippa Sylvia Corsie Trustee 24 July 2024
None on record
Ben McDavid Trustee 24 July 2020
None on record
Anna Louise Jackman Trustee 07 May 2019
None on record
TOMASZ BRZEZINSKI Trustee 21 June 2017
None on record
DAVID PETERS Trustee 21 June 2017
None on record
RICHARD BUCKELL Trustee 21 June 2017
None on record
ROBERT JAMES MAYLEY Trustee
None on record
JANET MARY FIELDING Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.93k £374 £5.23k £12.95k £6.13k
Total expenditure £7.77k £5.25k £7.08k £8.10k £8.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 January 2025 350 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 Christchurch Park
SUTTON
Surrey
SM2 5TN
Phone:
07900392678
Website:

No information available