1ST/16TH SUTTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting for young people between the ages of 6 and 14
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Sutton
Governance
- 23 August 1972: Standard registration
- 1ST SUTTON SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeff Richards | Chair | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hanna Louise Randall | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Roy Binns | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah McLeod | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Randall | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BANBURY PERKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.22k | £4.91k | £304 | £9.15k | £11.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.13k | £5.83k | £2.45k | £8.73k | £13.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE SCOUT TRUST DEED 1935
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
SUTTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Snowdrop Road
Castle View Court
Eastbourne Road
Pevensey Bay
East Sussex
BN24 6BB
- Phone:
- 07792457784
- Email:
- pjrandall2003@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window