T A DELCOMYN BEQUEST IN CONNECTION WITH 1ST EAST PUTNEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouts are do-ers and give-it-a-go-ers. Yes, we go camping, hiking, swimming, abseiling and canoeing. But we also get to hang out with our friends, having fun, playing games, working in a team and taking on new challenges. Every week we give almost half a million 6-25 year olds the skills they need for school, college, university, the tricky challenge and the big dreams: the skills for life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 08 November 1962: Standard registration
- T A DELCOMYN BEQUEST IN CONNECTION WITH 1ST EAST PUTNEY BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Cowdry | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Jeffreys | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Darren Sean Hines | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Renouf | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mac Khosrow-Panah | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREAS STRAUB | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Straub | Trustee | 20 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE HOLLOWAY | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.75k | £12.87k | £26.25k | £15.85k | £18.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.06k | £11.68k | £17.37k | £16.77k | £21.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 20TH JUNE 1955
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF THE 1ST EAST PUTNEY GROUP OF BOY SCOUTS
Area of benefit
EAST PUTNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st East Putney Scout Group
42 Oxford Road
LONDON
SW15 2LQ
- Phone:
- 07957836880
- Email:
- treasurer@1epscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window