GREATER LONDON, SOUTH WEST COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 303884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of scouting as defined by the Scout Association in the areas known as Greater London South West defined by same association

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £289,386
Total expenditure: £234,349

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 December 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Claire Findlay Chair 29 June 2022
1ST HOOK SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Matthew Hewitt Trustee 12 June 2024
None on record
Richard Charles Goad Trustee 14 June 2023
CROYDON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Paul Roger Green Trustee 14 June 2023
SERVICE BY EMERGENCY RIDER VOLUNTEERS (SURREY & SOUTH LONDON)
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Neil Watson Findlay Trustee 07 June 2023
ROYAL KINGSTON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Asad Lone Trustee 29 June 2022
None on record
Alan Paul Brewer Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
Owen Gerard Dempsey Purcell Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Alexander James Swain Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Claire Rachael Pearcy Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
ANDREW JAMES ROBSON Trustee 06 June 2018
None on record
David Lawrence Rixson Trustee 08 June 2016
None on record
JACQUELINE PADDON Trustee 01 June 2014
ROYAL KINGSTON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
ANDREW PHILIP BECKETT Trustee 02 August 2013
2ND HOOK (ST PAUL'S) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
ROYAL KINGSTON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £215.61k £255.72k £33.82k £234.85k £289.39k
Total expenditure £232.40k £49.16k £62.88k £274.94k £234.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 14 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
42 The Mount
Worcester Park
KT4 8UD
Phone:
02087934935
Email:
No information available