LONDON SOUTH WEST COUNTY GUIDES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the education of girls and young women to help them develop emotionally, mentally, physically and spiritually so that they can make a positive contribution to their community and the wider world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lambeth
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 11 January 1972: Standard registration
- LONDON SOUTH WEST COUNTY GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alex Godfrey Stowbridge | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Hughes | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Dowley | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Owen | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caitlin Hargreaves | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Oberlander | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Noble | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Powell | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bethannie Welcomme | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Phillips | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Perkins | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neva Brentnall | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paige Hill | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Dean | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Littlechild | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.10k | £7.93k | £5.05k | £7.90k | £9.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.60k | £2.98k | £3.90k | £7.16k | £9.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2024 | 198 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2024 | 563 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 January 2022 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED, 1938
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
S.W. LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
75 FIELDVIEW
LONDON
SW18 3HF
- Phone:
- 07572625638
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window