Financial history MIDDLESEX EAST GUIDES

Charity number: 303888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £162.98k £151.08k £186.82k £149.14k £175.25k
Total expenditure £183.69k £188.53k £180.35k £151.57k £215.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £29.14k £29.46k £4.00k N/A