Trustees MIDDLESEX EAST GUIDES

Charity number: 303888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Nugent Chair 11 August 2023
None on record
Victoria Jayne Stratton-Stubbs Trustee 09 October 2023
None on record
Mary Josephine Boland Trustee 30 August 2023
None on record
Margaret Kelly Trustee 26 October 2020
None on record
Lynne Bishop Trustee 10 July 2019
None on record
Christine Swallow Trustee 10 July 2019
None on record
ROSA FOULSHAM Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
NICOLA DAVIS Trustee 09 April 2017
FINCHLEY AND FRIERN BARNET DIVISION OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
CHRIS ALLOWAY Trustee 15 March 2017
None on record
DAPHNE SUSAN GUNN Trustee 01 September 2011
SOUTHGATE DIVISION GUIDES
Received: On time
IRIS ANN PRINCE Trustee 20 August 2004
None on record