CONNAUGHT HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a meeting place for various groups or clubs within the environs of Attleborough and district.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £24,500 from 1 government contract(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 08 November 1962: Standard registration
- ATTLEBOROUGH PUBLIC HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JOHN THATCHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alysha Ayers | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Wilson | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ian Thorpe | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Max Fisher | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jay Coppin | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Emma Barrett | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Marie Coppin | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Jane Thorpe | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jim Parker | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH HAZEL THATCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.55k | £32.91k | £63.95k | £74.07k | £50.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.77k | £33.32k | £31.42k | £28.98k | £45.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £45.00k | £56.40k | £24.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19TH MAY 1950 as amended on 22 May 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF A VILLAGE HALL, READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES, CLASSES, RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ATTLEBOROUGH WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ATTLEBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Blackthorn Road
Attleborough
NR17 1YJ
- Phone:
- 01953457279
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window