BACTON-ON-SEA VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall with Wi-Fi internet facilities. Fully accessible main hall, and annex/meeting room. Providing a Community Hub with keep fit, medau, art group, book group, gardening club and local history group,childrens' play group, craft groups, line dancing. Available to hire for business meetings, parties, events and local groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 24 May 1963: Standard registration
- BACTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hazel Berry | Trustee | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jacobs | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Daniels | Trustee | 05 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liam Larter | Trustee | 05 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Coral Salih | Trustee | 05 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elisa Pendered | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.64k | £32.88k | £11.78k | £12.03k | £15.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.94k | £20.10k | £8.29k | £16.25k | £17.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.72k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 July 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 July 2022 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 24 MAY 2004. as amended on 26 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
SUBJECT TO CLAUSE 25, THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BACTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Coast Road
Bacton
NORWICH
NR12 0ES
- Phone:
- 00000 00000
- Email:
- elisabactonvh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
facebook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window