BEETLEY VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running and up-keep of village hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 07 November 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADAM DALE LUCK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
GARY HINCHLIFFE | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK ALAN FOX | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN FORAN | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
JUNE OVERALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANK ARTHUR HAVERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JASON LUCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.20k | £2.87k | £2.45k | £4.32k | £5.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.88k | £5.83k | £5.64k | £35.48k | £6.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9TH APRIL 1960
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BEETLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
BEETLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BEECH ROAD
BEETLEY
DEREHAM
NR20 4EZ
- Phone:
- 01362860494
- Email:
- luckj8ke@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window