BROOKE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a village hall and playing field for the use of the residents of Brooke and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 31 January 1963: Standard registration
- BROOKE PARISH HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Harrison | Chair | 24 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Albinia Hoare | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Kerry | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Pitelen | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Jinks | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Friswell | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giles Hankinson | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Dixon | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Riley | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN TOBIN | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Steve Mears | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN TIMEWELL | Trustee | 09 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ISHBEL LOCHHEAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAGGIE SADLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAGGIE WORMALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.84k | £16.21k | £11.77k | £22.01k | £24.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.60k | £8.38k | £15.02k | £21.34k | £26.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.50k | £10.00k | £3.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME MADE BY THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR EDUCATION AND SCIENCE ON 28 JANUARY 1971, AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 22 SEPTEMBER 2003, AS AMENDED 21 OCTOBER 2003 AND 24 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BROOKE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
BROOKE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brooke Village Hall
Norwich Road
Brooke
NORWICH
NR15 1AB
- Phone:
- 07775846007
- Email:
- Brookevillagehall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
www,brookevillagehall.org,uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window