Trustees BRUNDALL MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 303916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janet Wesley Barrington Chair 03 July 2019
None on record
Alan Nigel Parsons Trustee 13 June 2023
None on record
Christine Ann Mason Trustee 01 June 2023
BRUNDALL MEMORIAL HALL
Recently registered
Diana Rosemary Buck Trustee 19 May 2023
None on record
Eleanor Rose Mason Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
Bridget Penelope Faith Warns Trustee 20 May 2021
None on record
Andrew Robert Bonham Trustee 20 November 2020
None on record
Patrick Edward Lovatt Trustee 17 May 2019
None on record
Aileen Janine Beck Trustee 17 May 2019
BRUNDALL MEMORIAL HALL
Recently registered