CLAXTON AND CARLETON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISING FUNDS AND MAINTAINING VILLAGE HALL FOR CONTINUING COMMUNITY USE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 23 February 1970: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FIONA MARY CANTRILL | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JANICE ANINA DIX | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|||||
JUDITH LYNN JACKSON | Trustee | 05 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER JAMES SKIPPER | Trustee | 05 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN ROGER GIDLOW | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL ANTHONY BALMER | Trustee | 02 June 2014 |
|
|||||
SARAH CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.17k | £30.71k | £9.39k | £8.11k | £7.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.85k | £9.90k | £13.51k | £15.13k | £7.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 03 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 DECEMBER 1968
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
CLAXTON AND CARLETON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREY GABLES
THE STREET
CLAXTON
NORWICH
NR14 7AS
- Phone:
- 01508480173
- Email:
- claxtonvh@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window