CRANWORTH JUBILEE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintainance of village community building as meeting place for community activities. Fundraising and organising of community activities to promote and support facility.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 29 July 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLE ANN STOAKLEY | Chair |
|
||||||
Kathleen Violet Newton | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Celia Anne Ireland | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE HUNT | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JOHN DEWING | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER JOY BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Robena Mary Brown | Trustee |
|
||||||
Charles Frederick Brown | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.11k | £28.87k | £3.64k | £4.95k | £5.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.35k | £1.99k | £4.13k | £6.72k | £4.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 20 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 4 MAY 1971 AND SCHEME OF 9 APRIL 1981
Charitable objects
PROPERTY TO BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR USE AS A YOUTH CLUB FOR THE PARISH OF CRANWORTH AND THE PROPERTY MAY ALSO BE USED BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL AND FOR OTHER EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CRANWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
JUBILEE HOUSE
CRANWORTH
THETFORD
IP25 7SH
- Phone:
- 01362 820068
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window