Financial history DENVER VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 303935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.44k £23.01k £13.11k £12.05k £15.10k
Total expenditure £14.01k £12.15k £17.33k £22.68k £11.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.71k £8.00k N/A £500