Trustees VILLAGE HALL (BRADENHAM)
Charity number: 303939

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christian Henry Allhusen | Chair |
|
||||||||
Carolyn Susan Brown | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Frank Olaf Christian Cann | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Garry Kenneth Smith | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Dorothy Hillier | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Lisa Clare Johnstone | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Julie Marion Stacey | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Teresa Frost | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|||||||
Peter Martyn Clements | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Philip Hayward | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Corine Clements | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Joseph Ostler | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
||||||
Daljit Kaur Ruppert | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.