Trustees FLEGGBURGH VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD
Charity number: 303951

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Payne | Chair | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE AVERRE | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Coombe | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARSHA BIRKETT | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Dawes | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
June Pratt | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
raymond Jennis | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janette Ely | Trustee | 19 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULIE DAWN OSBORNE | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.