GREAT ELLINGHAM RECREATION GROUND AND CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a building with kitchen, toilets, stage & seperate committee room, cricket pitches with 1 hard wicket, football pitches.Childrens Play Area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 27 September 1962: Standard registration
- GREAT ELLINGHAM RECREATION CENTRE (Working name)
- RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fransesca Elliot | Chair | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANTHEA JANE SCANE | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Gunn | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Alabaster | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
LYNN GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Banks | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alastair George Donald | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Mark Donald Bryan Humphrys | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Alabaster | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Roebuck | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Crick | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Brierley | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Beales | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ESTELLA LEECH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN GENT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.86k | £12.04k | £15.88k | £30.94k | £44.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.60k | £15.61k | £13.42k | £31.96k | £34.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 1 MARCH 2001.
Charitable objects
(A) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND, AND (B) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GREAT ELLINGHAM, NORFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brick Kiln Farm
Hingham Road
Great Ellingham
ATTLEBOROUGH
Norfolk
NR17 1JE
- Phone:
- 01953 454715
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window