Accounts and annual returns HOCKWOLD PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 303978
Charity reporting is overdue by 1618 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days
Annual return 01 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 523 days
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 523 days
Annual return 01 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 888 days
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 888 days
Annual return 01 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1253 days
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1253 days
Annual return 01 February 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1618 days
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1618 days