Financial history HOLME HALE PLAYING FIELD MANGEMENT COMMITEE

Charity number: 303979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £24.90k £21.39k £22.23k £35.67k £21.29k
Total expenditure £16.20k £31.72k £16.67k £27.88k £32.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £450 N/A N/A N/A N/A