INGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing facilities for use of local people whether as individuals or on a Club basis i.e. Bridge, Craft, Art, Fitness. Party venue. Charity's own functions for fundraising and social events for local people. Recreation Ground to encourage a healthy population!
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 20 May 1963: Standard registration
- INGHAM VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANGELA SCHROEER | Chair | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christine Hazel Butler | Trustee | 08 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Maria Allen | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Deborah Ward | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Murray Charles Ward | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janice Grace | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
DARREN ROGERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE SHIRLEY POWLES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.35k | £14.43k | £23.76k | £44.90k | £8.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.39k | £4.04k | £4.82k | £8.95k | £24.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.90k | £17.82k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 30TH OCTOBER 1984
Charitable objects
PROVISION IN THE PARISH OF INGHAM OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
PARISH OF INGHAM AND ITS IMMEDIATED VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Landell
Brick Kiln Lane
Ingham
NORWICH
NR12 9SX
- Phone:
- 01692 218164
- Email:
- angela.schroeer@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window