KENNINGHALL MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a meeting place for all village activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 20 May 1963: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr P Forster | Chair | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Giles Edward Branford | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Freda Holman | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Gennie Mountney | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Daniel James Myhill | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Gerald Sutton | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Kevin Mark Edwards | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jeremy Hall | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Mr I Copeman | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Mrs J Bush | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
MR P KAY | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Anne KAY | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Ms S Bailey | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Mrs MEA Wood | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £415 | £927 | £27.29k | £21.37k | £28.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.36k | £13.81k | £49.63k | £17.15k | £28.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.67k | £500 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 27TH AUGUST 1954
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KENNINGHALL AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEATH FARM
LOPHAM ROAD
KENNINGHALL
NORWICH
NR16 2DT
- Phone:
- 01953888320
- Email:
- anne.kay250@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window