THE KING'S LYNN YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Current non active
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 31 March 1965: Standard registration
- 23 March 2011: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 23 March 2011: Funds transferred to 212810 NATIONAL COUNCIL OF YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIAT...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 19 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 25 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 04 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST APRIL 1982
Charitable objects
TO LEAD YOUNG PEOPLE TO THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND THE FULLNESS OF LIFE IN HIM AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window