INSTITUTE OF FUNDRAISING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is "Excellent fundraising for a better world". We work towards that by improving the environment for fundraisers through policy and support. We increase understanding by being a knowledge centre for fundraisers and the general public and through setting fundraising standards. We enable fundraisers to be the best they can be by providing resources, skills development and qualifications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 February 2000: Standard registration
- THE INSTITUTE OF CHARITY FUNDRAISING MANAGERS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bruce Tait | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Rand | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Miller-Hughes | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Monwara Ali | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Damian Chapman | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harpreet Kaur Kondel | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Gary Kernahan | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Parkes | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Mansell | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Sofia Zeenat Sheikh | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.02m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.23m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £116.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £78.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £171.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.77m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £2.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.97m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £265.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £62.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/07/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE INSTITUTE ARE ESTABLISHED ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE OR PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM (AS DEFINED IN SECTION 11 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011); (B) TO PROMOTE HIGHER STANDARDS OF ADMINISTRATION AND FUNDRAISING FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES (AS SO DEFINED) THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM; (C) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO THE MATTERS REFERRED TO IN ARTICLES 2.1 AND 2.2 THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canopi
82 Tanner Street
London
SE1 3GN
- Phone:
- 02078401000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window