VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Village Hall and Recreation Ground
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 26 March 1963: Standard registration
- LUDHAM VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Pinning | Chair | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacque Wright | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barry Whitehouse | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Grist | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Kim Brett | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Keeble | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Derek Oakes | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Sutton | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqui Doran | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Richard Floate | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL EDWARD SMITH | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS MAGGIE SMITH | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR BRUCE MOFFAT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LUDHAM PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL ANNE WILLOUGHBY | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANNE MOFFAT | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS WINNIE BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.07k | £50.23k | £29.23k | £12.66k | £12.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.22k | £16.00k | £63.53k | £9.01k | £9.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.80k | £40.38k | £19.68k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 20TH FEBRUARY 1963 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 29TH FEBRUARY 1988
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS
Area of benefit
LUDHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Johnson Street
Ludham
GREAT YARMOUTH
NR29 5NY
- Phone:
- 01692 630 145
- Email:
- rdpinning7@aol.co.uk
- Website:
-
ludhamvillagehall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window