ST EDMUND'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity Number: 1137454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St Edmund's College is an autonomous, self-governing community of scholars, and one of the 31 colleges within the University of Cambridge.St Edmund's College can be distinguished from the majority of colleges in that it is classed as a graduate college and admits postgraduate students, mature undergraduates and affiliated students.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 August 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST EDMUND'S COLLEGE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Christopher Young Chair 01 October 2024
None on record
Dr Rafia Al-Lamki Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Professor Edwin Chilvers Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Dr Kristen Ann MacAskill Trustee 17 October 2023
None on record
Dr Matthew James Psycharis Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Kate Wilson Trustee 17 April 2023
None on record
Dr Vittorio Montemaggi Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Graham Ernest Watson Trustee 30 November 2020
None on record
Dr Gemma Burgess Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Edward Hone Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Dr Katharina Brett Trustee 01 June 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.48m £7.93m £9.34m £10.46m £13.11m
Total expenditure £7.17m £7.82m £9.15m £9.84m £11.26m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.19m £1.29m £1.49m £1.48m £1.79m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.84m £6.24m £7.47m £8.35m £10.39m
Income - Endowments £0 £1.29m £0 £0 £831.00k
Income - Investment £291.00k £306.00k £344.00k £585.00k £848.00k
Income - Other £165.00k £93.00k £46.00k £45.00k £76.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £39.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.02m £7.72m £9.05m £9.73m £10.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £156.00k £94.00k £99.00k £106.00k £125.00k
Expenditure - Governance £18.00k £21.00k £25.00k £27.00k £26.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £189.00k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £81.52m £80.77m £79.86m £79.73m £79.00m
Long-term investments £7.83m £9.19m £9.09m £9.16m £9.60m
Other assets £3.69m £3.69m £5.23m £5.92m £8.77m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£770.00k -£609.00k -£445.00k -£361.00k -£98.00k
Total liabilities £51.34m £50.53m £50.86m £50.86m £51.35m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 04 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 04 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 15 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 29 May 2024 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 02 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 02 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 10 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 10 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 02 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 02 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MOUNT PLEASANT
CAMBRIDGE
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
UNITED KINGDOM
CB3 0BN
Phone:
01223761095