Trustees SOLICITORS PRO BONO GROUP

Charity Number: 1064274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALASDAIR FERGUSON DOUGLAS Chair 15 June 2016
None on record
Emma Tunstall Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Richard Atkinson Trustee 22 October 2024
None on record
Deborah Smith Trustee 25 October 2022
None on record
Ian Jeffery Trustee 25 October 2022
None on record
Emma Rehal-Wilde Trustee 23 April 2019
None on record
James Goldsmith KC Trustee 19 October 2018
None on record
GEMMA WATTS Trustee 07 February 2018
None on record