NECTON RURAL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity manages the community centre for the use of village clubs covering all age groups, private hire for parties, wedding receptions, meetings, fund raising activities by other charities, art exhibitions, job interviews etc. It is open for private hire by responsible persons over the age of eighteen from inside and outside the village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 27 January 1964: Standard registration
- NECTON PLAYING FIELD AND VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Necton Parish Council | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.69k | £24.82k | £18.97k | £19.18k | £21.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.94k | £14.69k | £11.38k | £18.27k | £24.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.69k | £11.41k | N/A | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 9 JANUARY 2003. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
(1) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION OF A RECREATION GROUND; AND (2) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF NECTON IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parish Office
13 Tun's Road
Necton
Swaffham
Norfolk
PE37 8EH
- Phone:
- 07752226110
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window