Accounts and annual returns NORFOLK FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS

Charity number: 304029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 18 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 18 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 08 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window