POTTER HEIGHAM PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES HALL AND OPEN SPACE FACILITIES FOR RESIDENTS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 13 February 1963: Standard registration
- POTTER HEIGHAM VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- POTTER HEIGHAM VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Trantum | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Jane Sharpless | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Chaplin | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Tween | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Ball | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Eady | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Katya MIller | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stanley Chapman JP | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Donald Peter Pickering | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Ann Margaret Parker | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheridan Turner | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
HARRY WILLIAM MAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.33k | £12.33k | £12.94k | £16.80k | £21.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.77k | £14.77k | £17.80k | £17.84k | £22.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.68k | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 24 MAY 1991 as amended on 19 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND.
Area of benefit
POTTER HEIGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carstan House
Station Road
Potter Heigham
Great Yarmouth
NR29 5AD
- Phone:
- 01692670039
- Email:
- sbchapmajp@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window