ROCKLANDS PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A charity run by a small committee of volunteers who provide and maintain a playing field and pavilion for use by the local communities for sporting activities. At present we provide facilities for 2 adult football teams and eight junior football teams. Also 2 adult cricket teams, and youth teams and U15s, U13s and U11s all playing league cricket. We also have a children's play area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 07 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Buckland | Chair | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
SARAH GOOD | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|||||
MARTIN RUSSELL WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES ALGER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.96k | £26.23k | £13.89k | £12.32k | £47.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.37k | £25.42k | £25.98k | £17.37k | £53.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £9.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST OCTOBER 1964
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ROCKLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Playing Field Pavilion
Green Lane
Rockland All Saints
ATTLEBOROUGH
Norfolk
NR17 1UA
- Phone:
- 01953483312
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window