Trustees SEDGEFORD VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND
Charity number: 304058

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Sindle | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neville Woolley | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Knight | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ward | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Wade | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Gregory Coleman | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diana Hallford | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Wade | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Carter | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Wallace Ward | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.