SHELFANGER VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide premises and recreational facilities for the parishoners of Shelfanger village and the neighbourhood. The Village Hall trustees are committed to ensuring all members, likely members,volunteers and members of the public are treated favourably on the grounds of gender,marital status, race, religion, age, ethnic origin or sexual orientation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £940 from 3 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 30 July 1963: Standard registration
- SHELFANGER VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ryan Stocking | Chair | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen King | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carla Ellis | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Martin | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rowan Ellis | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matt Le Grys | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Major | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Lord | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Le Grys | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matt Skilton | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Gingell | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gingell | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN HURST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER CHARLES CHALLONER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.77k | £33.18k | £24.38k | £19.48k | £12.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.95k | £23.91k | £16.80k | £27.76k | £19.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.57k | £14.00k | N/A | £940 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 April 2024 | 797 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 MAY 1961 AND CONVEYANCE DATED 2 NOVEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 10 FEBRUARY 1984
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL AND A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF SHELFANGER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SHELFANGER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shelfanger Village Hall
Common Road
Shelfanger
Diss
Norfolk
IP22 2DP
- Phone:
- 01379 640042
- Email:
- shelfangerchair@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window