Trustees SHELFANGER VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 304059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ryan Stocking Chair 19 May 2024
None on record
Stephen King Trustee 04 March 2025
None on record
Carla Ellis Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Leigh Martin Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Rowan Ellis Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Matt Le Grys Trustee 08 August 2023
None on record
Kate Major Trustee 08 August 2023
None on record
Ivan Lord Trustee 08 August 2023
None on record
Karen Le Grys Trustee 08 August 2023
None on record
Matt Skilton Trustee 08 August 2023
None on record
Amanda Gingell Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Mark Gingell Trustee 11 July 2019
None on record
MARILYN HURST Trustee
None on record
ROGER CHARLES CHALLONER Trustee
None on record