STALHAM AND BRUMSTEAD RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recreation Ground
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 25 June 1963: Standard registration
- 15 April 2024: Funds received from 1177191 STALHAM POPPY CENTRE TRUST
- RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STALHAM TOWN COUNCIL | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £35.29k | £23.41k | £47.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £7.69k | £39.07k | £57.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF SECRETARY OF STATE FOR EDUCATION AND SCIENCE SEALED 30TH JANUARY 1973
Charitable objects
A RECREATION GROUND AND CHILDRENS PLAYGROUND.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STALHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 HIGH STREET
STALHAM
NR12 9AS
- Phone:
- 07881638145
- Email:
- clerk@stalhamtowncouncil.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window