THE VILLAGE HALL STRATTON STRAWLESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to continuously update and improve facilities at Burroughes Hall in order to meet health, safety and access requirements. The hall is regularly decorated to encourage individuals, groups and other charities to use the facility. To do this the committee organises fundraising events throughout the year and obtains grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 13 April 1966: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSALIND COOK | Chair | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Farrow | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Kemp | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|||||
SYBIL MARY LORKINGS | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Jordain Le Mesurier | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANNE CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENISE FOSTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.60k | £10.69k | £4.81k | £6.28k | £6.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.55k | £2.23k | £3.46k | £12.14k | £9.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 22ND DECEMBER 1952
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STRETTON STRAWLESS AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITE GABLES
PARISH ROAD
STRATTON STRAWLESS
NORWICH
NR10 5LP
- Phone:
- 01603279345
- Email:
- ca.clark39@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window