Trustees THE VILLAGE HALL STRATTON STRAWLESS
Charity number: 304080

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSALIND COOK | Chair | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Farrow | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Kemp | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|||||
SYBIL MARY LORKINGS | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Jordain Le Mesurier | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANNE CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENISE FOSTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.