Accounts and annual returns TASBURGH VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS

Charity number: 304085
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 January 2025 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 07 January 2025 68 days late
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 March 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 June 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time