Accounts and annual returns TAVERHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304086
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 14 February 2025 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 14 February 2025 47 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 14 February 2025 414 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 14 February 2025 414 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 19 August 2024 600 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 19 August 2024 600 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 19 August 2024 965 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 19 August 2024 965 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 21 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 21 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window