Financial history TILNEY ALL SAINTS VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 304090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.27k £24.12k £17.03k £12.68k £12.79k
Total expenditure £13.33k £6.40k £5.90k £28.37k £14.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £22.71k £10.67k £1.37k £2.00k