Accounts and annual returns TOFTWOOD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 20 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 08 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 04 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required