Financial history WACTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 304099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.10k £26.01k £27.34k £7.30k £5.31k
Total expenditure £2.98k £3.68k £8.58k £6.89k £13.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £19.91k £10.67k N/A N/A